Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT BURSTEAD
Charity number: 1132012
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Michael Hall | Chair | 29 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Colin Douglas Heywood | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Catherine Lazarus | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Maria Blore | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carole Anne Heywood | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Shearer | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Robert Haughton Blore | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Folahanmi Olukoya | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Furness | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARY JENNIFER EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.