Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER HALL GREEN BIRMINGHAM
Charity number: 1131758
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Woodard Stephenson Rev | Chair |
|
|
|||||
June Martin | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Edward John Weir BA Hons | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Susan Wilson BA Hons | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adam North | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kay Pamela Stephenson | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Elizabeth Birch | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JULIA CLARE TORTISE BA HONS | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anne Burgess BA HONS | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID JOHN ANDREWS B Sc, Ph D | Trustee | 12 August 2011 |
|
|||||
PHYLLIS MARY BENEDIKZ | Trustee | 20 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD ROGER HILL | Trustee |
|
||||||
KATHRYN JUNE HAWKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JOSIE CRANE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN EDWARD DUNBAR | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.