THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, PONTELAND

Charity number: 1134771
Charity reporting is overdue by 33 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 33 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 33 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 07 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 18 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 21 July 2017 On time Download