Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY AND CHRIST CHURCH HENDON
Charity number: 1135848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Julie Anne Gittoes | Chair | 17 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Jill Alexandra Moore | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Graham | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Oluwakemi Taylor | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roslyn Dawn Band Ms | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gwantwa Seeta-Lucas | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Wilson | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA WHITE | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Peter Walker | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Murray Ayo-Adebanjo Mrs | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Anne Henney Mrs | Trustee | 23 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROSALIND ZOE WHITE Mrs | Trustee | 18 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Julia Francesca Peston Mrs | Trustee | 18 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
JEAN MARGARET COOPS MRS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Crispin Cross | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr David John Richard Morgan | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Patricia Ann Morgan | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.