Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SOULS, LANGHAM PLACE, LONDON
Charity number: 1132882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
49 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Uche Madukwe | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Ilona Greyling | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Vanessa Radom | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Man Ching Wong | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Jonathan Gillespie | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Ulrich Kaltenbronn | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Philip Keen | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rachel Oti | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev William Stileman | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Ben Okumu | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Marti Kiraly | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Chioma Onwere | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Luke Ijaz | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Hana Cho | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Celia Wyatt | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Chloe Black | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Caroline Orji | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Joanna Richards | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard East | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Charles Walter Douglas Skrine | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|||||||||
DEREK LOWE | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Alison Burn | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Jonathan Morrow | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Joel Huang | Trustee | 22 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Sophie Clarke | Trustee | 22 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Steven Legg | Trustee | 22 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Fiona Ochan | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Nathaniel Yisa | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Sarah Gawley | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Stephen Mackay | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Victor Truong | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Louise Smith | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Grace Ong | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
RICHARD BAGWELL | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr JENNY GALLAGHER | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr PAUL MICHAEL HAWKINS | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Sue Stamper-Iveson | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
STEVEN HO | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
ALISON MACKENZIE | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Mary Currie | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Brian Weaver | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
DAVID ROLLASON | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
James Brightwell | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Michael James Hall | Trustee | 22 November 2013 |
|
|||||||||
JEREMY THOMAS | Trustee | 22 November 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
JUDGE DAVID TURNER | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
ROBERT GEORGE PATRICK TURNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
JOHN RAMSAY ELLERTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
PAUL DAVID STAMPER-IVESON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.