WISBECH ST MARY PARENT, TEACHERS & FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1132502
Charity reporting is overdue by 35 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £400 £10.80k £16.06k £9.27k £16.49k
Total expenditure £150 £10.82k £12.16k £7.80k £14.30k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A