Governance THE PARACHUTE REGIMENT AND AIRBORNE FORCES CHARITY
Charity number: 1131977
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 05 October 2009: Standard registration
- 14 March 2012: Funds received from 1131546 SOLDIERS IN THE AIR
- 14 January 2015: Funds received from 1121647 THE PARACHUTE REGIMENT AFGHANISTAN TRUST
- 20 January 2016: Funds received from 280743 TRUST TO PRESERVE THE HISTORY OF 6TH AIRBORNE DIVI...
- 24 January 2020: Funds received from 206552 AIRBORNE FORCES SECURITY FUND
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- SUPPORT OUR PARAS (Working name)
- THE PARACHUTE REGIMENT CHARITY (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.