Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BEACONSFIELD

Charity number: 1132259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 22 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 15 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window