THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BLAKENALL TEAM

Charity number: 1135579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £59.41k £62.59k £62.51k £57.78k £41.61k
Total expenditure £63.18k £65.58k £51.52k £66.93k £53.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A