THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, CHEADLE

Charity number: 1134783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £603.40k £690.01k £648.24k £626.66k £765.36k
Total expenditure £621.48k £600.91k £696.43k £734.10k £683.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £39.36k
Income - Donations and legacies £501.10k £622.87k £525.59k £498.48k £712.41k
Income - Other trading activities £6.81k £865 £14.14k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £94.90k £65.96k £107.60k £118.85k £48.69k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £96 £68 £116 £9.26k £2.75k
Income - Other £498 £245 £795 £75 £1.51k
Income - Legacies £23.41k £58.98k £55.71k £427 £39.12k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £621.12k £599.38k £694.02k £731.47k £682.18k
Expenditure - Raising funds £355 £1.53k £2.41k £2.63k £1.77k
Expenditure - Governance £2.19k £1.65k £2.12k £2.11k £2.28k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0