THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, CROYDON

Charity number: 1133736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

27 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Anne Vernon Trustee 26 April 2017 None on record
ELIZABETH ANN GOUGH BSC Trustee None on record
Stella Olatidoye Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Pamela Janice Hall Trustee 20 April 2016 None on record
DENISE FRANCES MEAD Trustee None on record
DIANA JANE HEMMINGS Trustee None on record
Pamela Hall Trustee 28 April 2018
THE CHURCH TENEMENTS CHARITIES: EDUCATIONAL AND CHURCH BRANCHES
ST EDMUND'S CHARITY Received: 9 days late
FRIENDS OF CROYDON PARISH CHURCH Received: On time
Justine Marshman Trustee 26 April 2018 None on record
DIANE ELISABETH EDWARDS Trustee 29 April 2015 None on record
Lorraine Paruma Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Arlene Esdaile Trustee 26 April 2017
THE CHURCH TENEMENTS CHARITIES: EDUCATIONAL AND CHURCH BRANCHES
ST EDMUND'S CHARITY Received: 9 days late
FRIENDS OF CROYDON PARISH CHURCH Received: On time
Ann Young Trustee 28 April 2014 None on record
MELVYN DAVID MEAD Trustee None on record
JENNIFER ANN MUSCHAMP Trustee 28 April 2014 None on record
Penelope Juliet Elizabeth Hall Trustee 26 April 2018 None on record
Rev PATRICIA VOWLES Trustee 30 July 2012 None on record
Susan Elizabeth Williams Trustee 20 April 2016 None on record
LAURENCE WILLIAM GOUGH BSCHONS MA Trustee None on record
ELAINE KATHRYN COOPER FIBMS DMLM Trustee None on record
Rebecca Paulraj Trustee 26 April 2017 None on record
Brian Barclay Trustee 26 April 2017 None on record
STEPHEN JOHN WILLMER Trustee None on record
DEBORAH MILLER Trustee 30 July 2012 None on record
Rev Andrew Bishop Trustee 05 September 2018 None on record
Susan Gail Kibler Trustee 26 April 2018 None on record
Karen Stewart Trustee 28 April 2019
CROYDON HARRIERS (ATHLETICS CLUB)
Derry-Anne Hammond Trustee 28 April 2019
DUNOTTAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION LIMITED Received: On time