Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WHICKHAM

Charity number: 1132270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window