Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WHICKHAM

Charity number: 1132270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £179.21k £169.87k £216.55k £135.36k £113.97k
Total expenditure £180.18k £174.20k £174.33k £123.55k £122.57k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £19.47k £16.78k