Trustees INCHI TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 1138670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr RAYMOND BOUCHER | Chair | 14 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sonja Heidi Marlene Herres-Pawlis | Trustee | 18 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anne Nijs | Trustee | 18 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pieder Caduff | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adam Sanford | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Bruno | Trustee | 18 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Herrn Dr Steffen Pauly | Trustee | 23 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Hartshorn | Trustee | 21 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN KIDD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.