Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH BEDFORD
Charity number: 1134785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Jonathan Thomas | Chair | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jean Cottenden | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Gardner | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr JONATHAN JAMES DAY | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennie McAdam | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tony Robert Daniels | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Marshall | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin William Hamilton | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Jane Somervell | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas William Rees | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Paul Stevens | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Ellen Day | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Baxter Russell | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Antony Brown | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Kamau Gicharu | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Edward BERRINGTON | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUE TEMPLEMAN | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL MARGARET BENNETT | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
KAY PATRICIA BERRINGTON | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL FREDERICK BISHOP | Trustee | 09 March 2008 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.