Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, ROYSTON
Charity number: 1132876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Steven Robert Sivyer | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Stuart Rodgers | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Christine Dyer | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vaughan West | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Elizabeth Wicks | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Nigel Wicks | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Francis Maze | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Kenneth Perry | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Dwight | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Reginald William Bailey CBE | Trustee | 27 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
David John Atkins | Trustee | 25 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kay Denise Makowiecki | Trustee | 25 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Louise Mary Atkins | Trustee | 25 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clare Elizabeth Davies | Trustee | 25 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Savage | Trustee | 23 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
tracy reader | Trustee | 13 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JOHN FOX | Trustee | 18 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA GEORGINA WATKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRENDA JEAN STRANGLEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOANNE JOSEPHINE ROSINA WALLIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP RAYMOND BURCHELL FCA. | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LIZ WAINWRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev JOHN HARVEY FIDLER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.