Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN'S, HURST GREEN, SURREY

Charity number: 1133107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 July 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 July 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window