THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, FELPHAM

Charity number: 1133732
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WENDY MARGARET BARRETT Trustee None on record
Robert Anthony Beasley Trustee 24 April 2019 None on record
Jeanette Fido Trustee 28 March 2017 None on record
Susan Holmes Trustee 24 September 2020 None on record
GERALDINE SIMMANS Trustee None on record
Lois Christine Thompson Trustee 10 November 2020 None on record
Joan Margaret Bull Trustee 12 April 2016 None on record
YVONNE ELIZABETH HAMMILL Trustee 08 April 2014 None on record
Nicholas Wand Trustee 24 April 2019 None on record
Janette Penn Trustee 12 April 2016
CHICHESTER AREA TALKING NEWS CIO Received: On time
4SIGHT VISION SUPPORT Received: On time
Margaret Treacy Trustee 24 April 2019 None on record
Peter French Trustee 24 September 2020 None on record
Rev John William Challis Chair 25 April 2018 None on record
David Lowen Trustee 24 September 2020 None on record
Anne French Trustee 24 September 2020 None on record
James George Edwin Rushman Trustee 24 April 2019 None on record
Maureen Williams Trustee 28 March 2017 None on record
Elizabeth Wand Trustee 24 April 2019 None on record
STEVE CHRISTIE Trustee 14 May 2011 None on record