Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES, ENFIELD HIGHWAY
Charity number: 1132582
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV IAN GALLAGHER | Chair | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Isichei | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dorah Allen Sabiiti | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Monica Pernella Robinson | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Harvey | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard William Griffiths | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary William Caffell | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Gordon Tweddle | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Field | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gwenllian Mair Tucker | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melloney Jayne Deacon-Powell | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
OGOCHUKWU UDUCHUKWU | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARIAN SHIRLEY ANN JACOBS | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ABIOLA AKINKUGBE | Trustee | 09 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
DEREK WOODWARD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.