Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, LUTON

Charity number: 1132078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev MICHAEL CHRISTOPHER JONES Chair 07 October 2013
WILLIAM CRAWLEY
Received: On time
THE AGNES POULTON CHARITY
Received: On time
LUTON CHURCH BURIAL GROUND
Received: On time
THOMAS AND EDWARD CRAWLEY
Received: On time
Thomas Connelly Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Catherine Nobles Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Bethany Whiting Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Richard Bratt Trustee 11 October 2020
Luton Community Chaplaincy
Received: On time
CHANTAL O'DONNELL Trustee 11 October 2020
LUTON CHURCH BURIAL GROUND
Received: On time
Yasmin Milligan Trustee 11 October 2020
None on record
Ruth Boctor Trustee 11 October 2020
None on record
Dawn Mortimer Trustee 11 October 2020
None on record
ANTHONY MOSS Trustee 29 April 2018
WILLIAM CRAWLEY
Received: On time
THOMAS AND EDWARD CRAWLEY
Received: On time
PETER GEORGE MICHELMORE ADAMS Trustee 24 April 2017
WELLSPRING ARTS TRUST
Received: On time
Penelope FIsher Trustee 13 April 2014
None on record
Anne Adams Trustee
CITY LIFE CHURCH LUTON
Received: On time
Andrew George Rodell Trustee
None on record
JOHN RICHARD SPURGEON Trustee
None on record
GORDON JOSEPH SHROSBREE Trustee
None on record
SUSAN MARGARET CARTER Trustee
None on record