ST MARY'S CHURCH, CHIPPING NORTON, PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL

Charity number: 1132070
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Bell Trustee 22 March 2015 None on record
Bloddyn Rees Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
Ursula Simpson Trustee 22 November 2020 None on record
Julian Clarke Trustee 20 November 2019 None on record
Benjamin Waddilove Trustee 22 November 2020 None on record
Graham Alan Povey Trustee 11 October 2013
THE BRANCH TRUST, CHIPPING NORTON (CIO) Recently registered
Nicola Riley Trustee 20 March 2016 None on record
Linda Carpenter Trustee 22 November 2020 None on record
Toby Artis Trustee 22 November 2020 None on record
Timothy Woolcock Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
Roger Simpson Trustee 22 November 2020 None on record
Judith Marshall Trustee 22 November 2020 None on record
David Bishop Trustee 20 March 2016 None on record
REV DR James Edward Kennedy Chair 11 October 2013
THE CHIPPING NORTON AREA CHRISTIAN TRUST Received: 13 days late
WYCLIFFE HALL Received: On time
PETER ANTHONY JOHN WILLIAMS Trustee None on record
Mark Carpenter Trustee 22 November 2020 None on record
JOSEPHINE MARY GRAVES Trustee
FRIENDS OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN PARISH CHURCH, CHIPPING NORTON Received: On time
HOME-START BANBURY & CHIPPING NORTON Received: On time
Jos Grant Trustee 17 March 2019 None on record