Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW, REDHILL
Charity number: 1132579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Josephine Hollister | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie-Anna Rush | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID RODNEY CHARLES LAMBERT HILL | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robina Wason | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Margaret Maden | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Holdsworth | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Whittle | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Baker | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Curphey | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Edmund Jones | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JULIE KNIGHT | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julia Anne Elfred | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN ROULSTON | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANNE BARBARA CURRIE | Trustee | 15 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Louise Hill | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
GEORGIA ANN WATERTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HILARY RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MS SCILLA WALLIS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.