Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S, CHICHESTER

Charity number: 1133785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £183.22k £171.31k £204.24k £274.44k £395.14k
Total expenditure £327.84k £175.85k £231.25k £289.13k £508.13k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £2.25k £30.00k