Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S, CHICHESTER
Charity number: 1133785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Elizabeth Cherry | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Jane Adams | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Mary Meaden | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katherine Helen Stephen | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margie Caldicott | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Anthony Holl | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chantal Emmanuelle Lushington | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bethany April Herrod | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeanne Elizabeth Taylor | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Denis Merrien | Trustee | 23 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Noel Avril Priestman | Trustee | 23 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Henry Rendell Tomlinson | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Jennifer Aitchison | Trustee | 14 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charles Gauntlett | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Foster | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Radford | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
REV'D RACHEL HAWES | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Margaret Joyce Heald | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|||||
RODERICK IAN SMITH | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.