THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREWS, KINSON, BOURNEMOUTH

Charity number: 1138074
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 15 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 17 July 2017 On time Download