THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREWS, KINSON, BOURNEMOUTH

Charity number: 1138074
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JON EDWARD FEWTRELL Trustee 04 May 2014 None on record
BRIAN ERNEST PHILLIPS Trustee None on record
Janette Vivien Rich Trustee 01 May 2015 None on record
DAVID ANTHONY ASTON Trustee 24 October 2013 None on record
RICHARD WILLIAM CREASE Trustee None on record
JENNY SUE PHILLIPS Trustee 11 October 2013 None on record
SIMON JOHN WAREHAM Trustee None on record
Su Patterson Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
REV LEE JASON SHIRVILL Chair 17 July 2014 None on record
SARAH LOUISE DAVIS Trustee 24 October 2013 None on record