THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT ALBAN THE MARTYR, HOLBORN WITH SAINT PETER, SAFFRON HILL

Charity number: 1135568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £318.98k £398.80k £294.06k £926.41k £298.18k
Total expenditure £344.90k £345.29k £334.01k £607.61k £308.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £712.59k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £200.06k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £12.11k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £1.66k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £653.77k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £333.40k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £20.44k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £2.19k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £1.38k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £20.44k N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £253.77k N/A