Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STOKE SAINT MICHAEL, COVENTRY
Charity number: 1133236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Graham Williams | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Bridget Sapiano | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mary POCKLINGTON | Trustee | 05 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Hopkins | Trustee | 05 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angela Dronfield | Trustee | 05 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graham Robert Medd | Trustee | 05 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Claire-Louise McARTHUR | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire May THOMPSON | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher DRONFIELD | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ann Lynn BROWN | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Neal William McGRATTAN | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.