Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, BARNES

Charity number: 1134840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Lennie Ross-McCall Trustee 29 April 2021
DIOCESE OF CYPRUS AND THE GULF FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Rev James Hutchings Trustee 22 July 2019
None on record
Christabel Gairdner Trustee 04 April 2019
None on record
Cate Summers Trustee 04 April 2019
None on record
Stephen John Cox Trustee 04 April 2019
None on record
Susan Mackworth-Praed Trustee 26 April 2018
None on record
Fouki Heller Trustee 26 April 2018
None on record
Elisabeth Munden Trustee 27 April 2017
None on record
MICHAEL HENDRY MURISON Trustee 27 April 2017
None on record
Catherine Putz Trustee 27 April 2017
None on record
Rachel Skilbeck Trustee 26 April 2016
None on record
WILLIAM HELLER Trustee 13 April 2014
None on record
PATRICK WILLIAM LAWFORD FINDLATER Trustee
THE CASTELNAU CENTRE PROJECT
Received: On time
Peter Martin Boyling Trustee
UNDER TREE SCHOOLS
Received: On time
JUDY GOWING Trustee
None on record
ANNE ELIZABETH SULLIVAN Trustee
None on record
PHILIP JOHN BLADEN Trustee
None on record
PAUL RICHARD TEVERSON Trustee
None on record