Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN, KIRKHEATON, WEST YORKSHIRE
Charity number: 1134019
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ian Robert Jones | Chair | 25 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Colin Luke Chawner | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles Rodney Manfield | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Mary Fairclough | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth Shaw | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Emma Elizabeth Walters | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Jean Littlewood | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Charles Sheard | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Mark Gurr | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Donald Sheard | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Alan Conley | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Julie Booth | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Irene Margaret Rodgerson | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert William Eabry | Trustee | 25 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Joan Dickinson | Trustee | 26 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD HOWITT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.