Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST PHILIP'S, DORRIDGE WITH ST JAMES', BENTLEY HEATH IN THE BENEFICE OF DORRIDGE AND BENTLEY HEATH

Charity number: 1133831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV Duncan Hill-Brown Chair
None on record
Rosemary Alison Routledge Trustee 16 October 2023
None on record
Felicity Price Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Christian Wyndham Hughes Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Caroline Helen Egan Trustee 11 January 2021
None on record
Andrew William Steven Carswell Trustee 19 October 2020
None on record
Sarah Elizabeth Jane Sasse Trustee 14 September 2020
None on record
Lisa Maines Trustee 09 May 2016
None on record
Colin Revans Trustee 27 July 2011
None on record
Derek Peter Timms Trustee
None on record
Stephen Paul Street Trustee
KNOWLE UNITED CHARITY
Received: On time
Richard Edmund Arbuthnot Trustee
None on record