Financial history FREE THE BEARS UK

Charity number: 1135682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £194.38k £68.45k £97.02k £58.23k £369.31k
Total expenditure £190.72k £86.90k £100.26k £58.15k £117.12k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A