Trustees CAMBRIDGE CYCLING CAMPAIGN
Charity number: 1138098

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Robison | Chair | 20 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Philip Carter | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Tween | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Philippa Emery | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Gabriel Bienzobas | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER GOTHAM | Trustee | 23 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Alessandra Caggiano | Trustee | 20 August 2020 |
|
|||||
SUE EDWARDS | Trustee | 04 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN HEYDON | Trustee | 16 September 2010 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.