THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST CLAYTON

Charity number: 1134841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 20 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 08 December 2016 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 08 December 2016 38 days late Download