THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PHILIP AND ST JAMES, CLIFTON, YORK

Charity number: 1133857
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 19 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 30 April 2017 On time Download