THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PHILIP AND ST JAMES, CLIFTON, YORK

Charity number: 1133857
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £247.97k £254.05k £219.10k £285.31k £193.96k
Total expenditure £257.35k £302.29k £249.89k £264.28k £212.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.69k £12.25k £4.08k £1.05k £934