THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PHILIP AND ST JAMES, CLIFTON, YORK

Charity number: 1133857
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Kirsty Dennett Trustee 01 July 2020 None on record
Paul Bates Dibley Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
Julian Andrew Cripps Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
Fiona Jane Whittle Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
Rev Andrew John Gready Chair 02 May 2018 None on record
Stanley Slade Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
Peter Robin Wallace Trustee 02 November 2020 None on record
DEREK MCRAE PATERSON Trustee None on record
Dr Judith Purton Trustee 26 April 2021 None on record
Julie Elizabeth McLeish Trustee 02 November 2020 None on record
Trevor Albert Charlton Trustee 02 November 2020 None on record
Rev John Hoyland Trustee 26 June 2021 None on record
Howard Iain Landon Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record
Garry Robert Parkes Trustee 25 April 2016 None on record
Jane Philpott Trustee 26 April 2021 None on record
Rosemary Catherine Swords Trustee 23 April 2018 None on record
Mark Endacott Trustee 26 April 2021 None on record