Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES, SOUTHBROOM, DEVIZES

Charity number: 1134059
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elliot Bruce Olav Wallace Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Kelly-Anne Marie Barker Trustee 12 May 2019
None on record
Alexander James Hobbs Trustee 12 May 2019
None on record
Dr Stephen Christopher Casey Trustee 12 May 2019
None on record
RICHARD SCOTT OLIVER OBE Trustee 22 April 2018
HAYFRAN TRUST
Received: On time
DEVIZES AND DISTRICT FOODBANK
Received: On time
DEVIZES OPENDOORS
Received: On time
Jenny Oliver Trustee 18 April 2017
None on record
JENNY JONES Trustee 17 April 2016
None on record
Rev KEITH BRINDLE Trustee 05 January 2016
None on record
David Sibson Trustee 26 April 2015
PRINCES MEAD SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
LIZ MCANAW Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
RACHEL HELEN GARDNER-POOLE Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
DOREEN ELIZABETH HUTTON Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
LAWRIE SMITHSON Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
MIKE WILMOTT Trustee 01 April 2013
None on record
CLARE LOUISE KENT Trustee 05 January 2012
None on record