THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS WITH ST JOHN, HERTFORD

Charity number: 1134035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Julia Gough Trustee 30 April 2017
ROGER DANIEL FOR SERMON AND POOR Received: On time
SIR JOHN HARRISON'S CHARITY Received: On time
ROGER DANIEL (FOR POOR PRISONERS) Received: On time
ALL SAINTS CHURCH FUNDS FOR ORGANIST Received: On time
Verity Ann Tranter Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
Helen Briggs BA. DMS Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
ANDREW BELFIELD Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record
ANDREW POVEY-RICHARDS Trustee None on record
WENDELL NEWBOLD Trustee None on record
Leon Ajao Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
Cllr Rosemary Anne Bolton JP Trustee 24 April 2011
NEWTON EXHIBITION FOUNDATION Received: On time
COLIN GRAHAM BIRD FCA Trustee
THE MARA RIANDA CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
ROGER DANIEL FOR SERMON AND POOR Received: On time
SIR JOHN HARRISON'S CHARITY Received: On time
THE ST ALBANS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
THE HOCKERILL EDUCATIONAL COMPANY LIMITED Received: On time
ROGER DANIEL (FOR POOR PRISONERS) Received: On time
ALL SAINTS CHURCH FUNDS FOR ORGANIST Received: On time
HOCKERILL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Mary Penny Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record
Ann Stephens-Jones Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
MRS J BIRD Trustee
CROUCHFIELD TRUST Received: On time
ANCIENT CHARITIES OF HERTFORD Received: On time
HERTFORD AND DISTRICT FOODBANK Received: On time
Nerine Janet Chalmers Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record
MARTIN GEOFFREY PENNY Trustee None on record
Dorothy Toyn Trustee 19 April 2015
CHARTERED SOCIETY OF PHYSIOTHERAPY MEMBERS BENEVOLENT FUND
REV JO LOVERIDGE Chair
ROGER DANIEL FOR SERMON AND POOR Received: On time
SIR JOHN HARRISON'S CHARITY Received: On time
ROGER DANIEL (FOR POOR PRISONERS) Received: On time
ALL SAINTS CHURCH FUNDS FOR ORGANIST Received: On time