AIDUCATION INTERNATIONAL UK

Charity number: 1136064
Charity reporting is overdue by 758 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 27 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 27 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 392 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 392 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 758 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 758 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 February 2020 461 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required