YMCA ONE LIMITED

Charity number: 1136700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 April 2021 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 January 2020 343 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 22 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required