Accounts and annual returns 17TH GILLINGHAM (ST. MARGARET'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1133220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required