Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHARLES WITH ST. MATTHIAS, PLYMOUTH
Charity number: 1134139
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Campion | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy McCusker | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dave Holland | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lizzie Percy | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Teressa Cornish | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Ansell | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeff Stephenson | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Mawson | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Stirling | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Horton | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Fraser-Crewes | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mike Knight | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dean Jacobs | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Bowker | Trustee | 10 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sally Pearson | Trustee | 10 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.