THE WILDLIFE AID FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1138944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £755.23k £1.23m £1.00m £1.06m £1.24m
Total expenditure £555.20k £650.65k £711.35k £708.07k £715.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £686.23k £1.16m £884.66k £913.60k £1.07m
Income - Other trading activities £31.88k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £24.28k £63.50k £49.44k £55.77k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £37.12k £47.94k £56.23k £93.72k £111.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £363.97k £775.58k £494.88k £527.36k £517.14k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £514.11k £625.35k £657.39k £647.22k £653.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £25.29k £53.96k £60.85k £62.88k
Expenditure - Governance £15.84k £9.20k £5.89k £7.00k £10.26k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £4.04k £8.18k £17.82k £14.08k £21.93k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0