Trustees SUTTON METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1135076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

45 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Catherine Hutton Chair 10 September 2020
None on record
Eleanor Rachel Gravenor BA MA PGCE Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
Abigail Hustler Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
Martin Lloyd Wright Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
Raviraj Saravanamuttu Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
Dr Paul Andrew Warren BSc PhD Trustee 14 September 2023
None on record
Robert Douglas Hill BA Trustee 14 September 2023
EPSOM METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Mark Angel Trustee 14 September 2023
EPSOM METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Katharine Lindsey Castledine BA FCA CTA Trustee 14 September 2023
EPSOM METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Christine Cox Trustee 14 September 2023
EPSOM METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Rev Hendry Ponniah M Min Trustee 14 September 2023
TRINITY CHURCH, SUTTON
Received: On time
Michael Robert Peter Ball Trustee 06 June 2023
None on record
Joshua James Selfe Trustee 02 February 2023
EPSOM METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Deacon Marie Poole BSc HNC Trustee 06 September 2022
None on record
Jane Rosemary Barden Trustee 07 June 2022
None on record
Richard Vijendran Asirwatham Trustee 09 September 2021
None on record
Rev Bethany Lynn Lewis Trustee 08 June 2021
None on record
Anthony Peter Woolfenden B.A. Trustee 08 June 2021
None on record
Ka Fai Man Trustee 10 September 2020
None on record
Rev Jongikaya Zihle Trustee 06 February 2020
Y CARE INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
HACKNEY METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
FOREST METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
WEST LONDON MISSION METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
METHODIST CHURCH IN TOWER HAMLETS
Received: On time
WESLEY'S CHAPEL AND LEYSIAN MISSION
Received: On time
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN ESSEX AND EAST LONDON
Received: 85 days late
LONDON CHURCH LEADERS
Received: On time
LONDON DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Rev Nigel Cowgill Trustee 05 September 2019
CROYDON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Methodist Conference Property at Central Hall Westminster
Overdue by 12 days
Eleanor Dorothy Pinfold LLB Trustee 05 September 2019
None on record
Richard John Cornwell Trustee 17 May 2017
TRINITY CHURCH, SUTTON
Received: On time
REV Ung Soon Nguang Trustee 08 September 2016
None on record
NELLIE IYAMIDE GEORGIANA SHOWERS Trustee 18 May 2016
None on record
MAUREEN ANGELA PATEL Trustee 21 May 2015
None on record
Caroline Elsie Mary Kingsnorth Trustee 15 May 2014
None on record
Rev Gill Long Trustee 07 February 2014
None on record
REV DES WILLIAMSON Trustee 01 October 2011
THE UNITED CHURCH OF ST MARK
Received: On time
BANSTEAD UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
EILEEN MARY RICE Trustee
None on record
JUDITH ANN YATES MA PGCE Trustee
None on record
Martin David Trenaman Trustee
EPSOM MALE VOICE CHOIR
Received: On time
THE UNITED CHURCH OF ST MARK
Received: On time
CHRISTINE REUBITHA ASIRWATHAM BA CMA Trustee
None on record
COLIN VICTOR BATTY Trustee
THE UNITED CHURCH OF ST MARK
Received: On time
AGE CONCERN (BANSTEAD)
Received: On time
JOHN WILLIAM MILLER Trustee
THE UNITED CHURCH OF ST MARK
Received: On time
CAROLINE JULIE COOK Trustee
CARSHALTON METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
SUSETTE ANN FORTY Trustee
CARSHALTON METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
RICHARD THORBURN SMITH BSC CENG Trustee
EPSOM METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
JACQUELINE MERIEL WAITE Trustee
CARSHALTON METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
MALCOLM BOOTH Trustee
TRINITY CHURCH, SUTTON
Received: On time
JOHN KINGSNORTH Trustee
CARSHALTON METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
PHILIP SANDIFORD Trustee
None on record
REV ANNE RUSBRIDGE Trustee
None on record
AUDREY JOAN SAUNDERSON Trustee
None on record
DAVID COLIN WORTHINGTON Trustee
None on record