EXETER COMMUNITY CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 1135162
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 31/03/2020
Total gross income £213.64k £246.53k £235.34k £344.62k £627.22k
Total expenditure £265.58k £280.89k £229.98k £260.69k £444.37k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £50.00k £89.87k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £262.36k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £364.47k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £387
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £443.38k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £997
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.72k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0