THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S KNIGHTSBRIDGE

Charity number: 1134857
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £562.88k £515.03k £508.18k £653.56k £470.00k
Total expenditure £570.75k £608.57k £566.63k £493.39k £447.87k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £354.72k £337.45k £349.06k £486.60k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £41.00k £58.19k £59.20k £58.11k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £68.04k £119.09k £99.60k £108.54k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £93.56k £292 £326 £309 N/A
Income - Other £5.56k £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £7.00k £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £569.32k £606.16k £564.97k £491.35k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.43k £2.40k £1.66k £2.03k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £4.15k £4.47k £4.47k £4.75k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £4.01k £2.00k £3.41k £2.16k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A