Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CATERHAM
Charity number: 1134342
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Cooke | Chair | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Cooke | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Laura Zajdlic | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Corbett | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
MaryClair Kelly | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diane Haslam | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Timothy James Smart | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Hamilton | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria De Handschutter | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Anne Samuels | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Huntley Hamilton | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Izzard | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Lydford | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Trevor Anthony Mapstone | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Izzard | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Merlin Skinner-Oakes | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jean Stevens | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Revd Frany Long | Trustee | 15 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER PELHAM CLEMENTI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Gay Elizabeth Russell | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BOBBY CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.