THE ED STEIN CITY SOCCER ACADEMY

Charity number: 1135125
Charity reporting is overdue by 1694 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 233 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 233 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 599 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 599 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 964 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 964 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1329 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1329 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1694 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1694 days