Financial history BOSTON METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1135515
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £195.70k £137.32k £138.99k £449.07k £128.87k
Total expenditure £133.76k £118.30k £181.08k £233.75k £160.85k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A